Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Contact with Minors - School Employees
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin and Raskin
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of a "person in a position of authority" relating to prohibiting an individual from engaging in a sexual act, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a minor under specified circumstances; prohibiting a person from engaging in a sexual act, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a minor under specified circumstances; and providing that a specified violation under the Act is not included within a specified definition for a specified registry.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {988370/3
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {988370/3
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (39-6)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2013 1/14/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {988370/3 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Laid Over (Senator King) Adopted 51
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments {988370/3 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Committee Amendment Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (39-6) 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 54
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 57
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-307, 3-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM