Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsored by
The President
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain reporting requirements that are obsolete, unnecessary, or duplicative; consolidating certain reporting requirements for efficiency; codifying certain reporting requirements for transparency; modifying certain reporting requirements for practicality; repealing the requirement that the Council for the Procurement of Health, Education, and Social Services establish a certain workgroup; repealing the Maryland Advisory Council for Virtual Learning; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0058
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843326/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Senate Rules
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {843326/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Text - Chapter - Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
(   8-804, 8-807 )
(   14-102, 14-302, 4-107 )
(   12-105, 2-107, 22-303, 23-105, 23-106, 5-217, 5-402, 6-118, 7-1002, 7-10B-01 through 7-10B-06, 7-119, 7-203, 7-204, 8-311, 9.5-112 )
(   3-204 )
(   2-107, 2-1209 )
(   4-501, 8-110 )
(   13-1003, 13-1004, 13-1103, 15-407, 19-108.2, 19-134, 19-143, 19-14B-01, 19-207, 19-214, 19-310.3 )
(   10-206, 8-605 )
(   15-10B-20, 15-1205, 15-1705 )
(   4-11A-03.2 )
(   12-824.1, 13-410, 2-307, 8-105 )
(   7-211, 7-505, 7-510 )
(   14-208, 14-303, 14-409, 15-111, 2-206 )
(   2-10A-01, 2-10A-11, 2-10A-12, 9-401 through 9-407, 9-701 )
(   10-110 )
(   1993, 1998, 2002, 2003, 2004, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2012, 2013, 2015 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page