Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission - Regulation of Fees and Charges
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, King, Klausmeier, and Manno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Workers' Compensation Commission to adopt regulations about payment for the examination of a covered employee and the preparation of a report by a medical expert engaged by a party; authorizing the Commission to regulate fees and other charges for examinations and the preparation of reports by medical experts under specified provisions of law; and prohibiting specified fees and charges from varying based on the party responsible for paying the fee or charge.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1092
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2015 1/29/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:39 PM