Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Bates, Cassilly, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, King, Middleton, Montgomery, Salling, and Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified definitions related to the regulation of milk products; repealing the limitation on the number of milk processor - farmstead cheese producer permits the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene may issue; repealing the requirement that an applicant for a milk processor - farmstead cheese producer permit operate a dairy farm with no more than 120 cows or goats in the herd; repealing the limit on the number of times a milk processor - farmstead cheese producer permit may be renewed; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0540
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed 24
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 26
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 28
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-401, 21-416.1, 21-417 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:39 PM