Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit for Qualifying Employees - Sunset Repeal
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Astle, Brinkley, Brochin, Colburn, Currie, Edwards, Garagiola, Getty, Glassman, Jacobs, Jennings, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Raskin, Simonaire, Zirkin, Jones-Rodwell, and DeGrange
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing termination provisions and altering dates of applicability for specified tax credits for employers that hire qualifying individuals with disabilities; declaring that the intent of the General Assembly is that the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, the Department of Disabilities, and the Department of Veterans Affairs make every effort to promote and market the Qualifying Employees with Disabilities Tax Credit to Maryland employers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0043
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {659135/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {225063/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {695369/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {695369/3 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments {659135/1 Report Adopted 22
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24
House 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 27
House 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {225063/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {695369/1 Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {695369/3 Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1997, 1998, 2000, 2003, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM