Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Assessment Reviews - Aids in Reviewing Property
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation, whenever practicable, to seek to obtain certain material or information that the Department considers to be a reliable aid in determining real property value from other State agencies on request of the owner of the real property under review when conducting certain reviews of real property assessments.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax - Assessment Reviews - Aids in Reviewing Property
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {289338/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax - Assessment Reviews - Aids in Reviewing Property
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax - Assessment Reviews - Aids in Reviewing Property
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {289338/1 Adopted 24
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Text - Third - Property Tax - Assessment Reviews - Aids in Reviewing Property
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Referred Ways and Means 27
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 11:26 AM