Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Corporations - Corporate Records and Electronic Transmission
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain records of a corporation to be maintained by means of any information storage device, method, or electronic network or database, including a distributed electronic network or database, under certain circumstances; requiring a corporation to convert a record maintained in a certain manner into a clearly legible written form on the request of any person entitled to inspect the records; authorizing certain communications, consents, and requests to be made by means of a certain electronic transmission; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0893 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Corporations - Corporate Records and Electronic Transmission
Senate 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable Adopted 19A
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Second Reading Passed 19A
Text - Third - Corporations - Corporate Records and Electronic Transmission
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 21
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Referred Economic Matters 23
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Text - Chapter - Corporations - Corporate Records and Electronic Transmission
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 2-111, 2-114, 2-115, 2-209, 2-210, 2-313, 2-504, 2-505, 2-510, 2-512, 2-513 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM