Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Pinsky, Miller, Benson, Brochin, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Oaks, Peters, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include the State as a member of the U.S. Climate Alliance on or before July 1, 2018; prohibiting the Governor from withdrawing the State from the U.S. Climate Alliance unless the General Assembly enacts a law approving the withdrawal; and requiring the Governor to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1 each year, beginning on or before December 1, 2018, on any collaborations among Alliance members and any policies or programs that the Alliance has endorsed or undertaken.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0003
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184134/1
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/8 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {883728/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-33)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {184134/1 20
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Committee Amendment Adopted 20
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/8 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 20
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 22
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Floor Amendment {883728/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 22
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22
Text - Third - Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 24
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 25
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (95-33) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM