Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental Care
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Feldman, Kagan, Kelley, and Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to the limitations of the State budget, and as permitted by federal law, to provide dental care for former foster care adolescents who, on their 18th birthday, were in foster care under the responsibility of another state or the District of Columbia.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0858
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2015 1/29/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:39 PM