Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Premium Finance Companies - Assignment of Rights and Obligations - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Conway, Feldman, King, Madaleno, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date of specified provisions of law relating to the authority of a premium finance company, with respect to specified motor vehicle insurance, personal insurance, and commercial insurance, to assign rights and obligations under a premium finance agreement and to pledge a premium finance agreement as collateral for a loan.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2015 1/29/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 22
Senate 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Second Reading Passed 22
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 24
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 26
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 64
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-301.2 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM