Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Feldman, Gladden, Kasemeyer, King, Madaleno, Manno, Pugh, Ramirez, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the prohibition on a person convicted of perjury from testifying in a proceeding; providing that evidence that a witness has been convicted of perjury shall be admitted for the purpose of attacking the credibility of the witness, regardless of the date of the conviction, if the evidence is elicited from the witness or established by public record during examination of the witness.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0237
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0673 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {878672/1
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {878672/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-22)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2016 1/15/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments {878672/1 19
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 19
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Favorable with Amendments {878672/1 Report Adopted 20
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 First Reading Judiciary 24
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (116-22) 61
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM