Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
School Vehicles - Seat Belts - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Kagan, Kelley, and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring school vehicles registered in the State and purchased on or after July 1, 2018, regardless of the date the school vehicle was manufactured or assembled, to be equipped with specified seat belts for every seat on the school vehicle; and providing for the application of specified requirements relating to seat belts on school vehicles.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - School Vehicles - Seat Belts - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - School Vehicles - Seat Belts - Requirements
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-153, 11-154, 11-173, 11-174, 22-412, 22-412.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM