Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2019
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Salling, Serafini, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to issue bonds to finance the construction of or improvements to certain public school facilities subject to certain limitations; establishing the Building Opportunity Financing Fund and the Building Opportunity Facilities Fund; beginning in fiscal year 2021, requiring $125,000,000 in the Education Trust Fund to be deposited into the Building Opportunity Financing Fund each fiscal year that bonds are outstanding and unpaid; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0153
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019, July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Building Opportunity Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Building Opportunity Act of 2019
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-601, 10-620, 10-628, 10-634, 10-649, 10-650, 10-658, 10-658.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM