Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Land Use Actions - Legislative Bodies - Judicial Review
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified person, who has been aggrieved by a land use decision, who is a taxpayer, or is an officer or unit of a local jurisdiction, to file a request for judicial review by a circuit court of a land use action of a legislative body; specifying persons that have standing to bring and maintain a specified action in a circuit court to allow judicial review of a land use action of a legislative body; and applying a provision of law to a charter county and to Baltimore City.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0243
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-103, 1-401, 4-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM