Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Police Officers - Secondary Employment
Sponsored by
Chair, Anne Arundel County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing Anne Arundel County to enact a local law that authorizes secondary employment of county police officers.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0175
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 14
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM