Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance Tax
Sponsored by
Senator Forehand
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a personal representative of an estate may file for an election for modified administration; providing that, if a personal representative discovers property after the time for filing a verified final report, the representative shall file a report and make a final distribution of the property within specified time periods; providing that an application to prepay inheritance tax for a subsequent interest may be filed with the register of the county where an information report was filed; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0858
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 8
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2013 2/05/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Second Reading Passed 19
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 21
House 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 First Reading Judiciary 24
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-702, 5-704, 5-706 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM