Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Sales Receipts Containing Bisphenol-A - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Lee, Montgomery, Pinsky, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from manufacturing, knowingly selling, or distributing in commerce any sales receipt containing bisphenol-A on or after January 1, 2017, except under specified circumstances; requiring a person to use a safe and legal alternative when replacing bisphenol-A in sales receipts; prohibiting a person from replacing bisphenol-A in sales receipts with specified carcinogens or reproductive toxicants; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM