Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors – Telehealth
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that regulations adopted under certain provisions of law regulating behavioral health programs include provisions authorizing a behavioral health program licensed as an outpatient mental health center to satisfy any regulatory requirement that a medical director be onsite through the use of telehealth by the director.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0570
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0211 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {557676/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {376986/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/27 (Delegate Glenn) Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/02 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {613124/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {557676/1 Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 38
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {376986/1 Adopted 53A
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/27 (Delegate Glenn) Adopted 53A
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Motion Special Order until 04/02 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted 55
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Floor Amendment {613124/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted 58
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59A
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59A
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors – Telehealth
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Text - Chapter - Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors – Telehealth
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM