Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Beidle, Elfreth, Guzzone, Hester, Reilly, and Sydnor
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the University of Maryland, Baltimore to study the health effects of air traffic noise on communities near Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport since the implementation of the Next Generation Air Transportation System; requiring the study to evaluate health outcomes and certain costs; requiring the Governor to provide in the 2022 budget at least $100,000 for the study; requiring a report be submitted by September 1, 2022, to the Governor, the General Assembly, and certain county executives and councils; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0310
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {584536/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {814166/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-24)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Favorable with Amendments {584536/1 Adopted 31
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 33
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Referred Appropriations 34
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {814166/1 Adopted 49B
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49B
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (110-24) 50
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/20/2020 2:07 PM