Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $4,823,000, the proceeds to be used as grants to the Interagency Committee on School Construction and the Maryland State Department of Education for the renovation, repair, and capital improvements of qualified zone academies; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds and the further grant of funds to eligible school systems for specified purposes, subject to a requirement that the grantees document the provision of a required matching fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0153
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM