Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Leakage - Billing MC/PG 113-19
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to notify an account holder within 7 days after determining a 200% increase in water usage during the immediately preceding billing period; requiring that the notification required under the Act contain certain information, including information regarding a free inspection under certain circumstances; requiring an account holder to repair a water leak outside or inside the account holder's home within 30 days; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0647
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Leakage - Billing MC/PG 113-19
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Reassigned to Finance 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page