Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Benson, Forehand, Frosh, King, Madaleno, Montgomery, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, and Stone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the applicability of the prevailing wage rate law to political subdivisions, agencies, and public works on property where the State, a political subdivision, or an agency is the owner or lessee by altering the definition of "public body"; altering the dollar amount for public work contracts at which the prevailing wage rate law applies; requiring that prevailing wage rates be calculated using wage rates established by specified collective bargaining agreements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM