Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates and Benefits
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from considering certain benefits and distributions for purposes of determining allowable yearly income under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; prohibiting a certain carrier from increasing a certain premium under a policy or contract of long-term care insurance from June 1, 2018, to December 31, 2019, both inclusive; authorizing a certain carrier to increase a certain premium beginning January 1, 2020, only if certain conditions are met; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates and Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates and Benefits
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-703, 11-704, 18-116.1, 18-116.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM