Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Peace Orders – Relief Eligibility and Duration – Rape and Sexual Offenses
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin, Hester, Lee, Ready, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, and West
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a commissioner, if a petition is filed and there are reasonable grounds to believe that the respondent has committed rape or a sexual offense or attempted rape or sexual offense in any degree against the petitioner, to issue an interim peace order to protect the petitioner; authorizing a judge to issue a temporary peace order or a final peace order to protect a petitioner seeking relief if the underlying act for the petition is rape or a certain sexual offense; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0122
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {328179/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {512717/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-29)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Washington, Hester and Carter)
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Washington, Hester and Carter)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Shetty and Lopez)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Shetty and Lopez)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {328179/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judiciary 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - Third - Peace Orders – Relief Eligibility and Duration – Rape and Sexual Offenses
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {512717/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (106-29) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Washington, Hester and Carter) 62AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Washington, Hester and Carter) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Recede 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Shetty and Lopez) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Refuses Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Shetty and Lopez) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
(   3-1503.1, 3-1504, 3-1505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page