Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum hotel rental tax rate that Garrett County may impose from 6% to 8%; and altering the distribution of hotel rental tax revenue in Garrett County.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0244
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Favorable Adopted 29
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Second Reading Passed 29
Text - Third - Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 31
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Referred Ways and Means 33
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (128-9) 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594
Text - Chapter - Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-405, 20-415 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM