Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours certification within the State Department of Education beginning in the 2017-2018 school year; providing that the purpose of the certification is to recognize local school systems that implement school start times that are consistent with the start times recommended by specified State agencies; authorizing a local school system to submit an application for certification to the Department; requiring the Department to grant the certification under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0039
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1081 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424733/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-4)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {424733/1 Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (41-4) 65
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 70
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM