Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Kelley, Muse, Ramirez, Brochin, and Smith
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified definition of "convicted of a disqualifying crime" to include a case in which a person received probation before judgment for assault in the second degree, if the crime was a specified domestically related crime.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0294
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {968671/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (26-21)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Frick) Adopted (111-19)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-34)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {968671/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (26-21) 47
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Judiciary 52
House 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Frick) Adopted (111-19) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (98-34) 70
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:34 AM