Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Disabled Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, Recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and Disabled Veterans
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting from the requirement to obtain specified licenses any person serving in the Armed Forces of the United States who has a service-connected disability, if, while angling, possesses valid military identification or any resident serving in the Armed Forces on leave in the State, if, while angling, possesses a copy of the resident's official leave order; authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to issue specified complimentary hunting and fishing licenses to an out-of-state person under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1531
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344733/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {970415/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senators Simonaire, Zucker, and Rosapepe
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Delegates Stein, Folden, and Gilchrist
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {344733/1 Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 33
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {970415/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senators Simonaire, Zucker, and Rosapepe 65
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 House Refuses to Recede 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Delegates Stein, Folden, and Gilchrist 70
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-303, 4-607, 4-614, 4-745 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM