Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Elfreth, Feldman, Griffith, Lee, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Washington, West, Lam, Ellis, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, and Simonaire
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 602
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person that is subject to the Forest Conservation Act to demonstrate that appropriate credits generated by a forest mitigation bank in the same county or watershed are not available before the person may pay money to a State or local forest conservation fund to meet certain requirements; prohibiting a local authority from collecting money into its forest conservation fund unless it has submitted to the Department of Natural Resources the mitigation plan and accounting procedures; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0272
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {104638/1 Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 38
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments {550012/1 Adopted 54
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (120-15) 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 602
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1610, 5-1613 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM