Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship Program - Alterations to the Award of Scholarship Funds
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Defining the term "local promise scholarship" as a community college scholarship program in effect on July 1, 2018, that provides a scholarship to any high school senior who is eligible for enrollment at the community college; and specifying that if an award recipient is eligible for a local promise scholarship, an award under the Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship program shall be credited to the tuition of a scholarship recipient before the award of a local promise scholarship.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0268
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship Program - Alterations to the Award of Scholarship Funds
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {334934/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship Program - Alterations to the Award of Scholarship Funds
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 41
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Appropriations 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 53
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Text - Chapter - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship Program - Alterations to the Award of Scholarship Funds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-3601, 18-3602, 18-3604 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM