Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Anne Arundel County Warrant Intercept Program - Extension
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending, from September 30, 2013, to September 30, 2018, the termination date of a program that requires the Comptroller to withhold, under specified circumstances, the Maryland income tax refund of specified residents of Anne Arundel County with an outstanding warrant or specified individuals that have an outstanding warrant from Anne Arundel County; requiring the Comptroller to provide a report on or before December 1 of each year on the implementation of the programs; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1360
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Second Reading Passed 29
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 32
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 35
House 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-940 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM