Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors of Limited Income
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Astle, DeGrange, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County or of a municipal corporation in Anne Arundel County to grant, by law, a tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property owned and used as a principal residence by an individual who is at least 62 years old and of limited income; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1269
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {669532/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {683221/1 (Senator Astle) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors of Limited Income
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {669532/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Floor Amendment {683221/1 (Senator Astle) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors of Limited Income
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Ways and Means 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors of Limited Income
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page