Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Report
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing, from $20 to $40, the amount of the surcharge on certain recordable instruments that the State Court Administrator is required to establish for the Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0529
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {688470/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Report
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
47B
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Surcharge on Recordable Instruments
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {688470/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Report
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judiciary 47B
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:17 AM