Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Ferguson, King, and Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 752
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility requirements for a Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship; altering the employment requirements relating to a service obligation associated with a scholarship; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission's annual report to the General Assembly to include data on the number of scholarship recipients who received a baccalaureate degree from a 4-year institution in the State and the number of scholarships for which the service obligation was deferred, waived, or converted into a student loan; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships - Revisions
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {124131/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships - Revisions
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 41
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Appropriations 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {274664/1 Adopted 58
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-6) 59
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships - Revisions
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 752
Text - Chapter - Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-3601, 18-3603, 18-3604, 18-3607 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM