Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges – Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate Degrees – Tuition Assistance
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Community College Vocational Certificate, Apprenticeship Training Program, and Associate's Degree Tuition Assistance Program; specifying that participation in the Program is voluntary; requiring an individual, to participate in the Program, to enroll at a community college within 6 months of obtaining a high school diploma or a certain equivalent; requiring participants to complete at least 15 hours of community service; providing certain reimbursement to community colleges for foregone tuition; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0976
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0678 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Community Colleges – Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate Degrees – Tuition Assistance
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-106.1 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:35 AM