Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Bates, Currie, Eckardt, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Norman, Ready, Serafini, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified county boards of education to allow nonsectarian student-initiated voluntary prayer during mandatory and voluntary school-sponsored student events; providing that the Act does not diminish specified rights of specified individuals relating to free speech and the free exercise of religion; providing that the exercise of specified rights may not be construed as a specified support, approval, or sanction of the contents of a specified prayer; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0955
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-104.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM