Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Hester, Guzzone, Carter, Hough, Kagan, Lam, Peters, West, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 652
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the policy and purpose of provisions of law governing flood control and watershed management to include establishing a grant program to assist local jurisdictions with infrastructure repairs, watershed restoration, and emergency protection work associated with a flood event; authorizing the Department of the Environment to use the comprehensive flood management grant program to award grants to subdivisions that incurred infrastructure damage of at least $1,000,000 caused by a flood event on or after January 1, 2009; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0428
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program - Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments {659230/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Funding
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {840518/1 Adopted 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (107-27) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Peters, Griffith and Eckardt) 62A
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Peters, Griffith and Eckardt) 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Recede 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Lafferty, Cassilly and Gaines) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Refuses Recede 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Lafferty, Cassilly and Gaines) 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {683920/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {683920/1 Adopted 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (107-24) 67
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 652
Text - Chapter - Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-801, 5-802, 5-803 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM