Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Benson, Kagan, Kelley, Manno, Pinsky, Smith, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a consumer reporting agency from charging a consumer a fee for placing a security freeze if the consumer has not previously requested the placement of a security freeze from the consumer reporting agency; and altering the contents of a specified notice that must be included with a specified summary of rights provided to the consumer.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0212
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0665 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {117372/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873892/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-42)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Reilly and Klausmeier)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Reilly and Klausmeier)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Waldstreicher, Aumann and Kramer)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Waldstreicher, Aumann and Kramer)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {453126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {453126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-48)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {117372/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Economic Matters 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {873892/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (95-42) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Reilly and Klausmeier) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Reilly and Klausmeier) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Refuses Recede 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Waldstreicher, Aumann and Kramer) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 House Refuses Recede 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Waldstreicher, Aumann and Kramer) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Conference Committee Report {453126/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Conference Committee Report {453126/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (92-48) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Text - Chapter - Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
(   14-1212.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page