Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Currie, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Middleton, Montgomery, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, Stone, Young, Astle, Garagiola, and Mathias
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering eligibility requirements for the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and the definition of "former foster care adolescent" to conform to federal eligibility requirements; authorizing the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to provide specified grants; adding to the purposes for which a specified assessment in hospital rates may be used; exempting the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange and its employees from specified provisions of law governing third party administrators; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0228
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, January 1, 2014, January 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {307973/2 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments {307973/2 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {263229/1 Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Third Reading Passed (35-11) 54
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 57
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-103, 19-143, 19-214 )
(   14-502, 14-504, 15-1303, 15-140, 27-405, 31-101, 31-103, 31-106, 31-107, 31-107.1, 31-107.2, 31-108, 31-111, 31-112, 31-113, 31-113.1, 31-114, 31-115, 31-116, 31-117, 31-119, 6-101, 6-103.2, 8-301 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM