Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Beidle, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Gallion, Hershey, Jennings, Peters, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Phasing out, over 2 taxable years, a certain limitation on the amount of certain military retirement income that may be included in a certain subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax; applying the act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0361
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:58 PM