Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsored by
Senators McCray, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Ellis, Feldman, Guzzone, Hayes, Kagan, Lam, Lee, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, Zucker, and Augustine
Status
Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 11
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying the State minimum wage rate that is in effect for certain time periods and for certain employers except under certain circumstances; authorizing the Board of Public Works to temporarily suspend an increase to the minimum wage rate if the seasonally adjusted total employment is negative, subject to certain limitations; requiring the Governor's proposed budget for certain fiscal years to include certain rate increases for certain community service providers over the funding provided in certain legislative appropriations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0166
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Enforcement (Fight for Fifteen)
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {577171/1 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Miller) Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {577171/1 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Kelley) Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {577171/1 Adopted 45A
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {143220/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (18-29) 45A
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {803524/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31) 45A
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {603926/2 (Senator Young) Rejected 45A
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {563824/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected 45A
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {803929/1 (Senator Hester) Rejected (18-27) 45A
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45A
Text - Third - Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Economic Matters 46A
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {393297/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted (96-41) 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (93-44) 47
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kelley, Feldman and Augustine) 47A
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 49
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 49
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kelley, Feldman and Augustine) 49
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 House Refuses Recede 49
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates D.E. Davis, Wilson and Dumais) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 House Refuses Recede 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates D.E. Davis, Wilson and Dumais) 48
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Conference Committee Report {793622/1 Adopted (32-13) 50
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 50
House 3/21/2019 3/16/2019 Conference Committee Report {793622/1 Adopted 51A
House 3/21/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (94-43) 51A
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Post Passage 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Overridden (32-15) 56
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Overridden (95-43) 55
Post Passage 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 11
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-201.3, 16-201.4, 7-307 )
(   3-413, 3-413.1, 3-419 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM