Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy – Tiers 1 and 2 Sources – Modifications and Compliance Fee
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "Tier 1 renewable source" to exclude waste-to-energy; extending the eligibility of certain Tier 2 renewable sources for purposes of the renewable energy portfolio standard in certain years; altering the compliance fee for a shortfall from the required percentage of energy from Tier 2 renewable sources for the renewable energy portfolio standard in certain years; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0529
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Renewable Energy - Tier 2 Eligibility - Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {297476/1
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {297476/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {673422/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted (33-13)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {833929/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-6)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Renewable Energy - Tier 2 Eligibility - Extension
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {297476/1 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Hough) Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {297476/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Floor Amendment {673422/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted (33-13) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Floor Amendment {833929/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Renewable Energy – Tiers 1 and 2 Sources – Modifications and Compliance Fee
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (38-6) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 62 Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-701, 7-703, 7-704, 7-705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page