Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Complimentary Hunting and Fishing Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to submit an annual report to the General Assembly and the Department of Veterans Affairs on specified licenses issued by the Department of Natural Resources; authorizing the Department of Natural Resources annually to issue a complimentary Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Sport Fishing License to specified individuals; requiring the Department of Veterans Affairs, in consultation with the Department of Natural Resources, to make available to veterans in the State specified information; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 34
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 38
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-303, 1-405, 4-607, 4-745 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM