Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that two mayors from each member county or their representatives are to be appointed to the Tri-County Council for Western Maryland by the commissioners from their respective member county rather than by certain chapters of the Maryland Municipal League.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Text - Chapter - Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership
(   13-701, 13-702, 13-703 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:58 PM
Click to return on the top page