Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB0294


CH0546

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Annual Revenues of For-Profit Institutions - Limitation on Enrollment (Veterans' Education Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Ellis, Augustine, Beidle, Carter, Elfreth, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Kagan, King, Lee, McCray, Patterson, Pinsky, Reilly, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, and West
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 546
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain for-profit institutions of higher education and private career schools from enrolling new Maryland residents if, beginning in fiscal year 2023, federal funds exceed 10% of annual revenues; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to adopt certain regulations by December 1, 2020; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0593
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884934/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate P. Young) Adopted (127-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 546
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Higher Education - Annual Revenues of For-Profit Institutions - Limitation on Enrollment (Veterans' Education Protection Act)
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Favorable with Amendments {884934/1 Adopted 31
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Higher Education - Annual Revenues of For-Profit Institutions - Limitation on Enrollment (Veterans' Education Protection Act)
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 33
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Referred Appropriations 34
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate P. Young) Adopted (127-0) 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (127-0) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 546
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:22 PM