Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Possession of Marijuana - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin and Kittleman
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the penalty for use or possession of less than 10 grams of marijuana; making the violation a civil offense punishable by a fine not exceeding $100; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {178774/1
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {178774/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {173320/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-16)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {178774/1 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 43
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments {178774/1 44
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Committee Amendment Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {173320/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted 46
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 47
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Third Reading Passed (30-16) 48
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 First Reading Judiciary 49
House 3/19/2013 3/19/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM