Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Carter, Feldman, King, Klausmeier, Lam, Lee, Nathan-Pulliam, Smith, Washington, Young, and Hayes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each administrator of a hospital to provide patients with a certain patient's bill of rights; requiring each administrator of a hospital to provide certain patients with an interpreter, a translator, or other accommodation to provide assistance to patients; requiring each administrator of a hospital to conspicuously post the patient's bill of rights on the hospital's website and in areas of the hospital accessible to patients and visitors; requiring the Department of Health to submit a certain report by January 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0145
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0562 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {697371/2 Adopted 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 3/28/2019 3/29/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Text - Chapter - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:36 AM