Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Counties - Transportation Adequate Public Facility Law - State Highway Intersection
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin and Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a county from amending or repealing a transportation adequate public facility law in effect on January 1, 2016; requiring that the level of traffic congestion at a State highway intersection be determined by the State Highway Administration for the purpose of determining whether development is allowed under a county transportation adequate public facility law.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0442
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Senate 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing cancelled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM