Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Gladden, Kelley, Madaleno, Middleton, Montgomery, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing the Naturopathic Medicine Advisory Committee within the State Board of Physcians; providing for the composition of the Committee; providing for the terms of a Committee member; specifying the duties of the Committee; requiring the Board to adopt specified regulations; requiring the Board to set fees for the issuance and renewal of licenses; requiring the Board to pay the fees to the Comptroller; requiring the Comptroller to distribute the fees of the Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0402
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {934337/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {356482/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments {934337/1 Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 50
House 3/24/2014 3/19/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2014 3/28/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {356482/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-5F-01 through 14-5F-32 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM