Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Augustine, Elfreth, Feldman, Kagan, Lam, Lee, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying certain laws regarding net energy metering and community solar generating systems to customers served by a community choice aggregator; repealing a provision that prohibits a county or municipal corporation from acting as an aggregator under certain circumstances; establishing a process by which, beginning October 1, 2021, a county or municipal corporation or group of counties or municipal corporations may form or join a community choice aggregator; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0561
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0660 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 7-306, 7-306.2, 7-507, 7-510, 7-510.3 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:59 PM